|
07/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2054.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2459.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 959.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|