Assembly | 07/01/2019 | July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 996.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 805.) (April 23). | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | April 9 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |