|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3335.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1200.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1096.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 798.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
March 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|