California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB344 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill September 3, 2019
Bill June 27, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019