|
07/01/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 3896.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 3913.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Set for hearing June 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3813.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 4891.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
(Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 4672.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2020
|
May 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 820.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 464.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2019
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|