|
10/04/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 526, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 10. Page 3265.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1184.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1097.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 547.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|