California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill June 26, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019