California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB363 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019