California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB365 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Amended

Bill September 3, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019