Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2020 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2020 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3099.) (January 15). | ||
Senate | 01/08/2020 | Set for hearing January 15. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 12/04/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. | ||
Senate | 12/03/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |