08/30/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 208, Statutes of 2019. | |||
08/30/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 08/23/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2672.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2019 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 9). | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2019 | June 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1002.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 906.) (April 30). | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |