|
10/07/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 547, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2889.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3431.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 1241.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 798.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 768.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|