07/10/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2019. | |||
07/10/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/05/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2019 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2459.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2019 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 563.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 465.) (March 27). | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Set for hearing March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |