|
09/20/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 326, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2530.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2957.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1010.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 803.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|