|
08/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 209, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2728.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1275.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1098.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 715.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|