|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 644, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2466.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2907.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2019
|
June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 441.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2019
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|