|
10/09/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 702, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2786.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3171.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1029.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 805.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|