|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3345.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2459.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 823.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|