Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | April 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Set for hearing April 25 in EQ. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Set for hearing April 24 in EQ. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 551.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING, GOV. & F., and EQ. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING, GOV. & F., and RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 12/04/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. | ||
Senate | 12/03/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |