Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 439.) (March 26). | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Set for hearing March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |