Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | April 23 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | April 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |