|
09/27/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 370, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2327.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2808.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 921.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 549.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 465.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|