Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | April 23 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |