|
07/10/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 3896.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4889.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2020
|
Referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 3151.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3120.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2020
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|