California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB42 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Amended

Bill September 3, 2019
Bill July 1, 2019
Bill May 17, 2019