Assembly | 08/30/2019 | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2019 | July 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2019 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1201.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1099.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 547.) (April 3). | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |