Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | April 9 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 624.) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |