09/25/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2020. | |||
09/25/2020 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 09/09/2020 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2020 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2020 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5277.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2020 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 3). | ||
Assembly | 07/08/2019 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2019 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1880.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2019 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 1768.) (June 25). | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |