Senate | 02/03/2020 | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Archuleta. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 906.) (April 30). | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 774.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2019 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |