Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 491.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Set for hearing March 27. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |