California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB450 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2019

Amended

Bill August 14, 2019
Bill July 2, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019