California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB459 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill April 25, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019