|
10/04/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 527, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2951.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 820.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 548.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|