Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1249.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1100.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|