Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1154.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 846.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 511.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|