Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 01/15/2020 | January 15 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3100.) | ||
Senate | 01/09/2020 | Set for hearing January 15. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | April 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |