LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB492
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB492
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB492
Action History
Senate
02/03/2020
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
03/27/2019
April 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Senate
03/12/2019
Set for hearing April 2.
Senate
03/07/2019
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
Senate
02/22/2019
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
Senate
02/21/2019
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.