|
10/07/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 551, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2436.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2845.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 592.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 553.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|