|
09/06/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 272, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2243.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2728.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1179.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 799.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 712.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|