Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1101.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
March 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|