Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | April 23 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5. Page 806.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |