Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 463.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Set for hearing March 27. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 12/11/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 10. | ||
Senate | 12/10/2018 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |