Assembly | 08/30/2019 | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2019 | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2019 | (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 744.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 598.) (April 8). | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 331.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Set for hearing March 12. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 12/11/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 10. | ||
Senate | 12/10/2018 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |