|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 3034.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Quirk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 36. Noes 21. Page 2912.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 1056.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 846.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|