Assembly | 08/30/2019 | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2019 | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2019 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 24). | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2019 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1154.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 844.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |