|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 409, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2929.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2019
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 2908.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Set for hearing September 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2822.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3256.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
(Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1189.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1102.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 842.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|