|
09/28/2020
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2020
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 2.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5299.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
August 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1255.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1103.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|