California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB569 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2019

Amended

Bill July 2, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019