California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB570 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2019

Amended

Bill June 27, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019