|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3434.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1004.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 846.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|